A LITTLE BIT ABOUT ME
Mrs. Anjali Patil (CEO)
Anjali Patil is the chairman and chief executive officer of Golden Arrow. She had started the company recently in 2023 which is located in Mumbai, Maharashtra. Her vision is to help the people in developing and protecting their businesses all over India. She has been working as a bank-officer with State bank of Patiala for almost 15 years and in 2017. She was working as an Auditor and handling Nationalised Banks for Statutory Audit. Even she had worked in SBI, D.N. Road Branch Churchgate, Allahabad Bank Ghatkopar, Central Bank of India, Thane. She has also worked in FOREX for more than 6 years.
Our goal is to provide safe and secure experience to the customers and also to help their business grow in these tough worlds.
A LITTLE BIT ABOUT ME
SHRI KIRAN BHATIA
D.O.B. 29.5.1960
B.E.(Mech), LL.B, Boiler Proficiency Engineer, FIE
Served in Delhi Govt and Daman Administration for about 30 years. Total working experience is more than 40 years.
Retired as Chief Inspector of Factories nd Boilers, Daman in 2020.
Offered services during COVID.
Presently Proprietor of KIRAN BHATIA CONSULTANCY whose motto is DIGNITY and SAFETY in Workplaces and offers the following services:
Statutory and Legal Compliances
Accident Prevention
Incident Management
Safety Audits and Training
Knowledge Bank
COVID protocols
ONSITE Emergency Plans
Labour laws
Environment laws
Human Rights
The above Compliances could result in saving of Lives, Property, Brand, Reputation etc.
List of some of our Valuable Clients:-
1) Vedanta group
2) Sterlite group
3) Bhilosa group
4) KKCL(Manufacturer of reputed Jeans and Garments like KILLER Jeans, Easios, Lawman etc.)
5) Navnee Industries
6) Zobele Industries
A LITTLE BIT ABOUT ME
Dr.A M Murudkar
- Dr. Murudkar has served the Indian Air Force as a regular combatant Air Warrior from 8th January, 1966 to 30th July, 1981 and has subsequently became the Vice- Chancellor of two premier Universities of India. 2. Born on 21st June, 1946 in a well known family of Village Murud, Taluka Dapoli, Dist. Ratnagiri of Maharashtra State, Dr. Murudkar not only excelled in sports and games but also in academics, achieving as many as seven degrees including B. A. from Jiwaji University, Gwalior , M. A.(English Literature). from Karnatak University, Dharwad, LL.B. from Delhi University, LL.M. and Ph.D.(Law) from University of Mumbai and D.Litt. and LL.D. degrees from the prestigious overseas Universities. 3. He was practicing Advocate of Bombay High Court (1981 – 1990), apart from being a Law faculty in Govt. Law College, Mumbai, Jamnalal Bajaj Institute of Management Studies, Mumbai and Department of Law, University of Mumbai. 4. He was appointed as Special Metropolitan Magistrate for Greater Mumbai by Hon’ble High Court, Bombay (1993 – 1997) and subsequently, elevated to the post of Registrar, University of Mumbai (1999 – 2004). He was privileged to be appointed as the First Vice-Chancellor of JJT University, Rajasthan (2010), a rare honour given to a seasoned academecian! Once again he was appointed as ViceChancellor of Shri Venkateshwara University in U. P. (2012) and further nominated as Vice-Chancellor of Himgiri Zee University, Dehradun (2014). 5. During his long career, Dr Murudkar has received several honours and awards including the Paschim Star and Sangram Medal for his active role in the Indo-Pak War of 1971, commendation by IAF (1977), Scroll of Honour by University of Mumbai (2004), Life – Time Achievement Award by International Council of Jurists, London (2017), Amazing Air Veteran Award by Air Veterans Association (2021), Diamond of LIC – MDRT (Million Dollar Round Table, a international recognition) – Insurance Andvisor by LIC of India (2022) and Indian Air Force Air Veteran Super Achiever’s Award – 2023. 6. He was privileged to be decorated with Honorary Degrees of Doctor of Literature (D.Litt.) by Cosmopolitan Vocational University, Kingdom of Tonga at London (2018), Doctor of Laws (LL.D.) by European International University, Paris (2022). 7. At present he is a President, Air Force Association, Mumbai, and a active member of Indian Exsevices League, engaged in providing meaningful services to the ex-servicemen and civilians. He also gives consultancy services to the trusts and associations for establishment and running of institutions of higher learning. 8. The transformational and inspiring journey of over 5 decades of a village boy who has studied in late Shri Samant Guruji’s Gurukul known as Nav Bharat Chhatralay, Dapoli, from nobody to somebody, commencing from Air Warrior in youth to enlightened Advocate to Special Metropolitan Magistrate to Registrar to Vice-Chancellor of the premier Universities, as gigantic and famous as University of Mumbai, and administering hundreds of colleges, departments, specialised institutions consisting lakhs of students of diverse faculties in varied regions of India is really and incredibly inspiring and truly magical! 9. It’s truly heartening to note that he owes his phenomenal success to his parents, teachers and Indian Air Force and their power of inuence which unrecognisably transformed his life from Air Warrior to Vice- Chancellor
A LITTLE BIT ABOUT ME
Dr. S. Gowri Shankar
(Ministry of Environment Forest and Climate Change (MOEFCC))
Responsible for Implementation of Provisions of Prevention of Cruelty to Animals (PCA) Act 1960 and Rules thereof, Amendments in the PCA Act, Formulations of Rules and their notification and work relating to Committee for the purpose of Control and Supervision of Experiments on Animals (CPCSEA), formulation of new schemes and modifications existing schemes, Schemes for Provision for shelter Home International coordination with Ministries of Health • Inter-ministerial coordination with the Forest and Wildlife Divisions of the Ministry. Training programmes/workshops for SPCAs and AWOs and Administration of National Institute of Animal Welfare (NIAW) • In charge for 10 Regional Offices in different Regions of India, taking care of Environmental Clearances of Industries, Mines and Coal refineries to curb Environment Pollution, Forest conservation cases, Afforestation etc., • Served as Director (NIAW) and responsible for planning the activities of the Institute for Implementing the objectives and vision of the Institute. Apart from the above enabled General Coordination, RTI, Public Grievances, Ease of Doing Business, Media & IT for Ministry • Posted as Officer on Special Duty (OSD) to Hon’ble Minister of State, MoEFCC. • Assigned as Director for GC/EODB/ROHQ/Media/IT • Retired as Director on 28th February 2022 High Commission of India (London), Indian Council for Cultural Relations (ICCR), Ministry of External Affairs Deputy Director (Culture) (8th April 2011 to 31st August 2014) • Served as Dy Director for the Nehru Centre London to organise cultural Evenings, Exhibitions of Indian Book, Photograph, Paintings and other art forms. • Organised film shows, performances of dance and music, Seminars and discussion on India and supervise the Library and reading room at the centre.
• Maintained contact with educational, cultural and creative organisations and publishing houses. • Organised and delivered lectures on India Subjects at the Centre and in other places in London. • Provided accurate information on all aspects of Indian civilization, culture and contemporary developments to interested to interested Individuals and organization. Ministry of Civil Aviation, Government of India Under Secretary (Aviation Security) (29th February 2008 to 1 st April 2011) • Responsible for Administration of Bureau of Civil Aviation Security, a regulatory organisation created in India as per requirements of ICAO and also Review & Assessment for deployment of CISF Personnel at all airports in the country. • Responsible for all security matters related to agencies under the Ministry of Civil Aviation and also vigilance enquiry and taken adequate follow up measures for all organisations/agencies under the Ministry of Civil Aviation which includes DGCA, BCAS, Pawan Hans. Helicopter Ltd., NACIL etc. • Took initiative in ensuring compliance of European Union regulation on LAG items at Indian airports through coordination with EU team in India. • Handled all queries of Ministry of Civil Aviation relating to Right to Information Act. And also the Protocol assignments for meeting of foreign delegation with Hon’ble Minister, Ministry of Food Processing Industries (MoFPI) Addl. PS to Minister of State (I/C) (June 2004 to August 2007) • Responsible for all administrative matters of the Personal Section including Minister’s Tour Programme, Attending the constituency matters, Constitution of Task Force State wise. Assist in the preparation of Food law Bill was passed by Parliament and also extending grants/subsidy to Food Parks/Rice Mills/Food processing Industries. Government of India Tourist Office, New York, USA Assistant Director (October 2000 to February 2004) • Responsible for Promotion of Indian Tourism in America. Organized India Festivals and India Evenings, Printing of Brochures and other publicity materials • Dealing with Electronic and Print media • Submission of Quarterly and Monthly Reports Ministry of Tourism (on Deputation through UPSC) Assistant Director (July 1999 to February 2004) • Responsible for Except Chain hotels and recognized Hotels which dealt for interest subsidy wherein approximately 400 hotels from over all India were extended subsidy for Rs. 5 crores, as an incentive
• Prepared the Annual report of year 2000 for Ministry of Tourism Ministry of Defence, Government of India Section Officer (Naval Projects) (August 1998 to June 1999) • Responsible for Examination/Scrutiny of the Naval Projects in India and focal point for Parliamentary questions and Replying to audit paras related to Naval Projects. • Processed cases related deputation of the officials to Abroad and cases for financial concurrence. High Commission of India, London, United Kingdom Section Officer (February 1994 to August 1998) • Worked in Defence Supply Wing (RSU) and Coordinated in the requirement of 39 Ordinance Factories of Ministry of Defence. This includes source Identification of Defence Egypt, coordination with Royal Ordnance, Defence UK. • Organising visits of UK Defence officials to India and Indian Officials to UK and also Supply of Life saving drugs to PMO, President Sectt, Indian Govt. Hospitals Ministry of Defence, Government of India Section Officer (1990 to January 1993) • Major Governmental Ceremonies like Republic day Parade, Independence Day Parade Martyrs Day and all other important functions. Printing of invitation cards and other publicity material from Govt. Press for the above functions. • Opening of temporary offices like Tickets Counters, Reception/Boarding Lodging for participants coming from all over the country. • Conducting the Screening committee For Tableaux of all States and Union Territories, Schools and Folk Dances. • Screening the proposals of Medals to distinguished and exemplary Army, Navy and Air Force Personnel. • Coordination with ail Govt. Authorities in order to observe the Law and Order and successful completion of National Functions. • Received various commendation letters. Information, Broadcasting and Parliamentary Affairs, Government of India Assistant Private Secretary (1988-1990) • Responsible for effectively performed the duties given by Hon’ble Minister and Coordination within and outside Ministry of Broadcasting and Parliamentary Affairs • Prepared Briefing on Parliamentary matters and Co-ordinated between Home and Information Ministries.
Ministry of Defence, Government of India Assistant Private Secretary (August 1986 – August 1988) • Responsible for Adhering to the time Schedule for Republic day Parade and Independence Day Parade. Support in Printing of Invitation cards, Transport and seating arrangements for the same. EDUCATION QUALIFICATIONS Ph.D. Honorary Doctorate for Social work International Economic University of SAARC Countries 2018 MBA Specialisation in Tribal Tourism University of Sunderland, London, UK 2013 Post-Graduation Diploma in Strategic Management SDS College, Canary Wharf, London, UK 2012 B.A(HONS) German Language Jawaharlal Nehru University, New Delhi 1984 RECOGNITION/ ACHIEVEMENTS • Qualified UPSC Asst. Grade All India Examination and got CSS cadre in 1985 (Allotted Ministry of Defence in 1986) • Awarded for effective promotion of India Tourism in USA by Pacific Asia Travel Association (PATA), Washington & New York and Washington. (2000 – 2004)
Successfully completed basic AVSEC Course organised by Bureau of Civil Aviation Security on the pattern of International Civil Aviation Organisation. The Course covers procedures, practices implemented in India in aviation security matters vis-a-vis their relevance with standards and recommended practices of Annex 17 to Chicago Convention. • Achieved Distinction out of 13 countries in the training programme of Airport Security Operations organized by International Air Transport Association (IATA) at Geneva during 2-6 November, 2009. • Selected as Joint Director (Broadcasting) for Organizing Committee, Commonwealth Games 2010 & Common Wealth Youth Games in India.